Financial history EDWARD PENLEY ABRAHAM RESEARCH FUND

Charity number: 309659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £2.34m £3.73m £1.83m £2.00m £2.47m
Total expenditure £2.06m £1.35m £1.81m £10.58m £5.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £130.95m £1.93m £1.81m £1.99m £2.46m
Income - Other £0 £1.80m £11.75k £11.53k £13.10k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.40m £974.45k £1.33m £10.09m £4.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £647.27k £363.82k £461.24k £491.78k £540.11k
Expenditure - Governance £15.57k £55.15k £72.28k £18.17k £20.61k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.39m £919.30k £1.26m £10.05m £4.39m
Expenditure - Investment management £647.27k £363.82k £461.24k £491.78k £539.08k
Expenditure - Other £10.58k £12.54k £16.99k £1.82k £0