CULHAM ST GABRIEL'S TRUST

Charity number: 309671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 17 January 2022 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 08 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 09 March 2018 On time Download