CULHAM ST GABRIEL'S TRUST

Charity number: 309671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £810.76k £737.41k £808.74k £793.26k £783.51k
Total expenditure £869.46k £1.05m £1.01m £568.46k £893.29k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £169.85k £58.95k £150.49k £125.00k £101.07k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £638.97k £674.47k £657.65k £668.25k £682.44k
Income - Other £1.94k £3.99k £599 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £869.46k £1.05m £1.01m £340.66k £668.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £13.24k £14.85k £16.20k £19.63k £11.88k
Expenditure - Grants institution £125.91k £271.41k £119.03k £128.43k £198.38k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £227.81k £224.96k