Financial history HEADINGTON SCHOOL OXFORD LIMITED GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 309679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £71.26k £68.81k £70.76k £64.40k £67.17k
Total expenditure £93.02k £92.91k £92.31k £83.27k £93.89k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A