Financial history NEW COLLEGE SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 309680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £4.19k £4.80k £4.37k £1.69k £2.00k
Total expenditure £6.51k £4.20k £3.20k £2.40k £2.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A