Accounts and annual returns ST EDWARD'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 309681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 March 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 07 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 23 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 June 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 02 June 2020 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 24 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 28 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window