Accounts and annual returns RYE ST ANTONY SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 309685
Charity reporting is overdue by 163 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 163 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 163 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 03 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 August 2019 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 20 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window