Financial history THE GUY NEWTON RESEARCH FUND

Charity number: 309696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £224.86k £200.82k £295.66k £171.91k £172.72k
Total expenditure £221.07k £323.38k £314.65k £312.95k £352.89k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A