Accounts and annual returns BISHOP MONKTON VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS

Charity number: 1080633
Charity reporting is up to date (166 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 12 January 2024 166 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 18 January 2023 172 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 18 January 2023 172 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 18 January 2023 537 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 07 February 2023 1288 days late Download Open in new window