BISHOP MONKTON VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS

Charity number: 1080633
Charity reporting is overdue by 786 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £24.59k £24.13k £27.07k £23.84k £27.03k
Total expenditure £20.65k £15.57k £26.32k £18.52k £25.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A