Accounts and annual returns AL-MASOOM INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity number: 1061821
Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 304 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 304 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 July 2021 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required