HARTLEPOOL PEOPLE LIMITED

Charity number: 1062163
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £97.17k £64.31k £92.82k £88.13k £77.05k
Total expenditure £94.20k £97.75k £93.28k £93.83k £97.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A