Trustees CONGLETON COMMUNICARE
Charity number: 1083575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANNE SINCLAIR | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|||||
RUTH GARNER | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Tingle | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Alvarez | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rita Pennington | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Whitewright | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary Turner | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Walshaw | Trustee | 13 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANET EATON | Trustee | 19 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
RAY BOOTH | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA ELLEN WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.