THE WYNDHAM LECTURE TRUST FOR SECONDARY SCHOOLS AT WESTON-SUPER-MARE

Charity number: 309975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.42k £1.45k £1.49k £1.57k £1.59k
Total expenditure £1.25k £2.50k £1.25k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A