THE WYNDHAM LECTURE TRUST FOR SECONDARY SCHOOLS AT WESTON-SUPER-MARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports students attending the secondary phase Academies in Weston-super-Mare by providing grants for Humanities based field trips/visits covering historical, archeological, geographical, conservation and environment curriculum study or projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Somerset
Governance
- 18 December 1964: Standard registration
- THE WYNDHAM LECTURE TRUST FOR ELEMENTARY SCHOOLS AT WESTON-SUPER-MARE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Esch | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Bowen-Roberts | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Jessop | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Daniel Mcgilloway | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Jamie Peacock | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Catherine Mary Irving Gibbons-Antonopoulos | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angelos Markoutsas | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY SEARLE | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.57k | £1.59k | £1.62k | £1.25k | £451 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.80k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29TH OCTOBER 1926. AND SCHEME 11TH FEBRUARY 1991
Charitable objects
THE DELIVERY ANNUALLY OF A SERIES OF LECTURES TO BE GIVEN IN THE TOWN OF WESTON-SUPER-MARE ON THE HISTORY ARCHAEOLOGY OR ANTRHOPOLOGY OF THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET (MORE PARTICULARLY OF WESTON-SUPER-MARE AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS) FROM THE EARLIEST TIME TO THE PRESENT DAY SUCH LECTURES TO BE AVAILABLE FREE OF CHARGE FOR SELECTED PUPILS IN THE PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOLS IN THE URBAN DISTRICT OF WESTON-SUPER-MARE.
Area of benefit
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broadoak Academy
Windwhistle Road
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
BS23 4NP
- Phone:
- 01934 422000
- Email:
- emma.lincoln@clf.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window