Accounts and annual returns WORKINGTON MUSICAL FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1063943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 26 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 02 March 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 17 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 17 February 2020 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 27 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required