Financial history WORKINGTON MUSICAL FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1063943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £2.13k £11.00k £9.52k £11.45k £29
Total expenditure £3.11k £10.65k £10.16k £10.90k £691
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A