BASIS (REGISTRATION) LIMITED

Charity number: 1077006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.45m £1.39m £1.44m £1.50m £1.46m
Total expenditure £1.33m £1.22m £1.39m £1.53m £1.44m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.43m £1.38m £1.41m £1.48m £1.44m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £18.49k £19.73k £29.47k £26.04k £25.70k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.33m £1.22m £1.39m £1.53m £1.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £52.30k £62.12k £61.74k £43.54k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0