Accounts and annual returns ELEANOR HAMILTON EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 309997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 20 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 04 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 04 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 09 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 09 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 06 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 20 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 20 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window