Trustees LIFE EDUCATION EAST MIDLANDS LIMITED

Charity number: 1067601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Charles Kitch Chair
None on record
Wayne Kitchener Trustee 28 March 2024
THE CHRONIC GRANULOMATOUS DISORDER SOCIETY
Received: On time
ROGER MCDERMOTT Trustee 01 August 2022
WHITWICK AND DISTRICT U3A
Received: On time
David Brown Trustee 01 August 2022
THE ROTARY CLUB OF THE WREAKE VALLEY
Received: 52 days late
THE ARTS SOCIETY CHARNWOOD
Received: On time
Janet Gabrielle Sinclair Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
Pauline Bain Trustee 01 April 2022
THE TOWCESTER YOUTH COFFEE HOUSE PROJECT
Overdue by 49 days
Richard John Roberts Trustee 01 April 2022
NORTHAMPTON PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT GROUP
Recently registered
Stewart Buller Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Matthew Arthur Robert Phillips Trustee 08 March 2022
None on record
Carol Litowczuk Trustee 09 December 2020
None on record
William Alfred Banner Trustee
None on record
Susan Anne Archer Trustee
None on record
Anthony Donald Gamble Trustee
CORAM LIFE EDUCATION
Received: On time