WELLS CATHEDRAL SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 310212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £13.89m £15.06m £14.89m £15.80m £15.34m
Total expenditure £13.33m £15.39m £15.21m £15.28m £14.54m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £919.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.08m £557.11k £319.67k £282.00k £207.47k
Income - Other trading activities £189.63k £330.55k £211.78k £132.00k £160.70k
Income - Charitable activities £12.60m £14.17m £14.35m £15.39m £14.80m
Income - Endowments £1.47k £6.01k £5.01k £27.00k £4.06k
Income - Investment £22.98k £12.41k £5.66k £22.00k £23.74k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £144.70k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £80.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.96m £15.03m £14.96m £14.97m £14.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £366.75k £360.10k £244.97k £317.00k £401.00k
Expenditure - Governance £30.87k £67.38k £71.30k £362.00k £44.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £13.19k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £34.00k