WELLS CATHEDRAL SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 310212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kris Robbetts Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record
BARBARA CHRISTINE BATES Trustee None on record
Prebendary Harry Musselwhite FKC Trustee 28 June 2021 None on record
DAVID BROWN Trustee 24 March 2014 None on record
Elizabeth Shelton Trustee 30 July 2020 None on record
Andrew Gummer Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record
ROBERT POWELL Trustee 07 December 2015
THE WELLS CATHEDRAL CHORISTER TRUST Received: On time
THE SIR KEITH SHOWERING YOUNG MUSICIANS' AWARD Received: On time
MARTIN GORDON COOKE Trustee 25 March 2019
SALISBURY CATHEDRAL SCHOOL LIMITED Received: On time
DURLSTON COURT SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Rev Canon Nicholas Jepson-Biddle Trustee 24 March 2014 None on record
VERY REV DR JOHN HARVERD DAVIES Chair 03 January 2017
WELLS CATHEDRAL PRESERVATION TRUST Received: On time
THE WELLS CATHEDRAL TRUST Received: On time
THE BATH AND WELLS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
ANDREW COLIN CAMPBELL-ORDE Trustee 07 July 2017 None on record
Timothy William Hunt Lewis Trustee 23 March 2015
THE WELLS CATHEDRAL SCHOOL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF THE RIDGEWAY Received: On time
REVD CANON DR ROBERT JAMES Trustee 09 December 2019
THE CHARITY OF JOHN CHOLDITCH Overdue by 39 days
JOHN HILL'S CHARITY Overdue by 39 days
UNITED CHARITIES Overdue by 39 days