CAROLINE MAUD JAMES TRUST IN CONNECTION WITH BROADOAK SCHOOL

Charity number: 310259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Secondary Education

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £402
Total expenditure: £519

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • North Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 February 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CAROLINE MAUD JAMES TRUST IN CONNECTION WITH BROAD OAK SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN RENEE MARSHALL Chair 23 January 2018
None on record
Daniel Mcgilloway Trustee 01 September 2022
THE WYNDHAM LECTURE TRUST FOR SECONDARY SCHOOLS AT WESTON-SUPER-MARE
Received: On time
Rebecca Frise Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £397 £324 £320 £358 £402
Total expenditure £0 £0 £240 £252 £519
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Broadoak Academy
Windwhistle Road
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
BS23 4NP
Phone:
01934422000
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available