THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (YORKSHIRE PROVINCE) TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1068103
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 December 2020 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 December 2020 39 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 21 July 2016 On time Download