BOLTON SURTI SUNNI VOHRA MUSLIM ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1067122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019
Total gross income £22.28k £23.20k £21.39k £19.30k £23.67k
Total expenditure £10.94k £11.31k £7.29k £8.16k £10.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A