BELLE VALE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1073941
Charity reporting is overdue by 238 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 238 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 April 2021 65 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 February 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 November 2018 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 October 2018 638 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 January 2018 360 days late Download