BELLE VALE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1073941
Charity reporting is overdue by 230 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £136.50k £111.26k £136.50k £129.95k £135.18k
Total expenditure £141.30k £156.69k £141.30k £169.43k £155.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A