PLAZA COMMUNITY CINEMA

Charity number: 1062570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £820.20k £999.39k £1.05m £1.07m £971.12k
Total expenditure £700.52k £740.90k £960.34k £882.32k £956.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.93k £22.88k £15.31k £13.37k £14.77k
Income - Other trading activities £168.46k £148.20k £147.68k £113.91k £0
Income - Charitable activities £645.41k £827.67k £885.01k £940.90k £826.73k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £403 £642 £1.60k £2.34k £2.32k
Income - Other £0 £0 £49 £0 £127.30k
Income - Legacies £5.93k £10.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £687.65k £719.55k £944.64k £868.06k £949.90k
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.87k £21.35k £15.71k £14.26k £6.80k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0