Accounts and annual returns THE INDIAN MUSLIM WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1067746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 06 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 06 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 24 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 13 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 13 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 24 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 16 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window