Financial history THE INDIAN MUSLIM WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1067746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £587.57k £485.71k £434.24k £501.65k £862.87k
Total expenditure £585.22k £583.62k £534.08k £543.76k £700.25k
Income from government contracts £17.93k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £3.86k N/A £140.52k
Income - Donations and legacies £241.58k N/A N/A £143.02k £284.40k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £52.10k £48.82k
Income - Charitable activities £345.99k N/A N/A £306.53k £440.25k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £89.40k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £575.57k N/A N/A £543.76k £700.25k
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.65k N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £0 £5.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0