KEIGHLEY ASIAN WOMEN'S AND CHILDREN'S CENTRE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance education of children, provision of social welfare, facilitites for recreation/leisure, guidence and information provision and preventative health education with object of preserving mental and physical good health all within keighley paying particular attention to chidren under age of 5 and of asian orgin, female women of asian origin in keighley
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Total income includes £15,611 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 04 March 1998: Standard registration
- 06 June 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 06 June 2018: Funds transferred to 1162240 KEIGHLEY ASSOCIATION FOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN'S CENT...
- K.A.W.C.C.A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.99k | £76.51k | £72.94k | £48.56k | £17.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.14k | £78.00k | £62.02k | £81.03k | £32.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.06k | £20.74k | £15.61k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 15 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 16 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 16 December 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 04 February 2016 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 05 February 2016 | 5 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JANUARY 1985
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN KEIGHLEY WHO ARE UNDER FIVE YEARS OF AGE, AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE FOREGOING, CHILDREN OF ASIAN ORIGIN. 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, AND FOR EDUCATION OF FEMALE INHABITANTS OF KEIGHLEY AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE FORE-GOING WOMEN OF ASIAN ORIGIN. 3. TO PROVIDE COMPREHENSIVE ADVICE GUIDANCE AND INFORMATION TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THEIR WELFARE RIGHTS AND TO MAXIMISE INDIVIDUAL CLIENT'S INCOME BY INTERVENTION WITH STATUTORY AND VOLUNTARY AGENCIES. 4. TO PROVIDE PREVENTATIVE HEALTH EDUCATION WITH THE OBJECT TO PRESERVING MENTAL AND PHYSICAL GOOD HEALTH.
Area of benefit
KEIGHLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window