Financial history THE SANDWELL COMMUNITY CARING TRUST

Charity number: 1086162
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £12.54m £13.36m £13.79m £14.62m £13.99m
Total expenditure £12.71m £13.14m £13.41m £14.70m £14.07m
Income from government contracts £12.54m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £703.97k £477.34k
Income - Donations and legacies £42.74k £42.74k £42.74k £746.71k £477.34k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £12.50m £13.31m £13.75m £13.87m £13.52m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £304
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.30m £13.14m £13.04m £14.54m £13.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £103.99k £84.06k £74.39k £60.90k £75.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £402.52k £0 £369.83k £159.67k £158.41k