THE YORKSHIRE DALES MILLENNIUM TRUST

Charity number: 1061687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.06m £1.77m £1.53m £1.67m £1.73m
Total expenditure £929.57k £1.26m £1.51m £1.61m £1.79m
Income from government contracts £39.43k £54.34k £65.26k £34.03k £42.32k
Income from government grants £61.69k £72.22k £45.73k £81.01k £39.85k
Income - Donations and legacies £802.80k £1.15m £802.82k £734.34k £818.26k
Income - Other trading activities £41.91k £35.65k £38.21k £31.23k £50.11k
Income - Charitable activities £208.86k £590.02k £691.41k £902.34k £861.46k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.21k £2.43k £2.51k £3.47k £4.15k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £9.18k £294.04k £100.72k £79.53k £3.25k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £728.17k £1.06m £1.30m £1.34m £1.52m
Expenditure - Raising funds £201.39k £204.42k £209.65k £272.19k £272.76k
Expenditure - Governance £18.68k £19.20k £18.92k £21.63k £10.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution £119.21k £84.78k £266.17k £249.53k £310.13k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0