Trustees THE YORKSHIRE DALES MILLENNIUM TRUST
Charity number: 1061687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Noreen Khan | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Pratt | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Downs | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Page | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kelsey Ann Williamson | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Eloise Brown | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK CUNLIFFE-LISTER | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Tracy Ann Louise Walker | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Spencer | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS WHEELWRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Carl Lis | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.