GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 310466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Hopfensperger Trustee 06 June 2018
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
Birgitte Mager Trustee 01 June 2021
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
SUSAN G SOPER Trustee
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
Mark Merriam Trustee 03 March 2020
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES Received: On time
The Very Reverend Joseph Patricius Hawes Trustee 04 September 2018
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
OLD SCHOOL FUND Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
OLIVER WILLIAM PEACOCK Trustee
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
Gregory Luton Trustee 06 June 2018
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
John Augustine Trustee 29 September 2020
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
Rev Simon John Harvey Trustee 05 March 2019
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST PETER, BURY ST EDMUNDS Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
Hannah BLACK Trustee 07 March 2017
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
SIMON FRANCIS POTT FRICS Trustee
THE DAY FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE ICKWORTH CHURCH CONSERVATION TRUST Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
GENERAL THE HONOURABLE SIR WILLIAM HERVEY Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
THE LITTLE GIDDING TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
BURY ST EDMUNDS HERITAGE TRUST Overdue by 35 days
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
HENRY REGINALD SALTMARSH FCA Trustee
THE VOLUNTARY NETWORK Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
PAUL ANDREW KNIGHTS Trustee 29 April 2017
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
George EdwardJames COCKRAM Trustee
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
JOHN HENRY MORGAN GRIFFITHS Trustee
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
VIRGINIA BEVERLY DEAN Chair None on record