INSTITUTE OF WELSH AFFAIRS

Charity number: 1078435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £252.52k £327.01k £395.39k £302.34k £449.72k
Total expenditure £269.48k £314.17k £392.00k £340.93k £369.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £56.32k