INSTITUTE OF WELSH AFFAIRS

Charity number: 1078435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bethan Sara Darwin Chair 23 May 2019 None on record
HELEN FRANCIS MORTLOCK PEARCE Trustee 16 December 2016 None on record
Marc Thomas Trustee 24 May 2018 None on record
Valerie Livingston Trustee 24 May 2018 None on record
Alison Elizabeth Carole Wride Trustee 29 July 2020 None on record
Leena Sarah Farhat Trustee 29 July 2020 None on record
Dr EURFYL AP GWILYM Trustee
THE JAMES PANTYFEDWEN FOUNDATION (YMDDIRIEDOLAETH JAMES PANTYFEDWEN) Received: On time
LAURA MCALLISTER Trustee
FAW FOOTBALL IN THE COMMUNITY LIMITED Received: On time
Sarah Jane May-Hill Trustee 29 July 2020 None on record
Professor Kevin John Morgan Trustee 20 March 2014 None on record
Shereen Williams Trustee 29 July 2020
THE PRIORY FOR WALES OF THE MOST VENERABLE ORDER OF THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN OF JERUSALEM Received: On time
Alison Copus Trustee 24 May 2018 None on record
Anthony Pickles Trustee 24 May 2018 None on record
Helen Clare Molyneux Trustee 20 March 2014 None on record
FRANCES BEECHER Trustee 17 June 2014 None on record