Financial history MERCIAN SINGERS

Charity number: 1070238
Charity reporting is overdue by 76 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £9.57k £10.25k £10.54k £1.21k £6.21k
Total expenditure £8.45k £8.04k £1.56k £4.40k £5.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A