Accounts and annual returns THE JAMES MCLELLAN AND ANTHONY WHEELER MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 310484
Charity reporting is overdue by 1372 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 277 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 277 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 642 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 642 days
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1007 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1007 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1372 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1372 days
Annual return 31 July 2018 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required