Financial history THE JAMES MCLELLAN AND ANTHONY WHEELER MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 310484
Charity reporting is overdue by 1365 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018
Total gross income £8.82k £444 £445 £2.60k £1.99k
Total expenditure £406 £500 £550 £600 £1.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A