Accounts and annual returns MELTON MOWBRAY BUILDING SOCIETY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1067348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window