Financial history MELTON MOWBRAY BUILDING SOCIETY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1067348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £101.87k £19.88k £18.66k £19.95k £20.20k
Total expenditure £12.00k £22.42k £14.11k £16.90k £28.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A