Financial history THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY -LIVERPOOL BRANCH

Charity number: 1064074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £2.62k £2.60k £2.54k £2.99k £500
Total expenditure £3.07k £2.83k £2.64k £2.18k £436
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A