BODY OF CHRIST INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES (BCIM)

Charity number: 1063805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required