VOICE IN THE CITY MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the Trust is the advencement of the Christian religion and this is achieved mainly by holding missions and outreach events to promote the Good News of Jesus Christ in various parts of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Germany
- India
- Indonesia
- United States
Governance
- 18 April 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSANNA ELIZABETH HATTINGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TOBIAS VON STOSCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MONICA GAYLE CLAXTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PASTOR KENNETH GOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.28k | £26.77k | £30.57k | £192.26k | £54.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.33k | £66.27k | £42.60k | £55.21k | £26.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND TO PURSUE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lifecentral Church
Little Cornbow
HALESOWEN
West Midlands
B63 3AJ
- Phone:
- 01216024545
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window