FRIENDS OF SOWERBY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1061455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £4.90k £6.13k £6.57k £7.82k £3.16k
Total expenditure £5.84k £6.54k £5.82k £6.89k £2.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A