Financial history WOLVERTON SCIENCE AND ART INSTITUTE FUND

Charity number: 310652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £5.83k £6.43k £6.40k £5.26k £6.45k
Total expenditure £3.73k £3.74k £5.31k £7.91k £5.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A