Trustees JAMES COKER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 310834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID BOWTELL Chair
BRAINTREE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
ANTHONY EVERARD Trustee 01 May 2019
AGNES
Received: On time
BRAINTREE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
BRAINTREE AND BOCKING COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: 36 days late
FRIENDS OF BRAINTREE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Saif Rehman Trustee 01 May 2019
BRAINTREE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Rev NIGEL ADAMS Trustee 26 October 2017
CARE2SHARE
Received: On time
BRAINTREE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Keith Bain Trustee 15 June 2017
BRAINTREE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
John Baugh Trustee 28 May 2015
BRAINTREE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Stephen Tame Trustee 14 November 2013
STOCK EXCHANGE CLERKS FUND
Received: On time
BRAINTREE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
LYNN WALTERS Trustee 18 December 2012
BRAINTREE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
VANESSA SANTOMAURO Trustee 12 December 2012
BRAINTREE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
DAVID MANN Trustee
BRAINTREE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF BRAINTREE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Received: On time
GRAHAM SAVILL Trustee
BRAINTREE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time