KING EDWARD VI'S SCHOOL AT CHELMSFORD

Charity number: 310861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL JOHN LESLIE HUTCHINSON Trustee None on record
ANDREW BOLESLAW SOSIN Trustee None on record
JOHN GALLEY Trustee 12 June 2011 None on record
WALTER HALL JP Chair None on record
Stephen Peter Foakes Trustee 05 September 2019
BARKING AND DAGENHAM DISTRICT SCOUTS Overdue by 232 days
ROY THOMAS WHITEHEAD Trustee
SOUTH HANNINGFIELD PARISH ALLOTMENTS Received: On time
ANTHONY CARPENTER Trustee
CHELMSFORD YOUNG GENERATION AMATEUR MUSICAL SOCIETY Received: On time
MR J F ALDRIDGE Trustee
OPEN ROAD VISIONS Received: On time
THE CANON HOLMES MEMORIAL TRUST Received: 23 days late
THE MONSIGNOR WILSON MEMORIAL FUND Received: On time
NEW HALL SCHOOL TRUST Received: On time
STOW MARIES GREAT WAR AERODROME LTD Received: On time
KENNETH GEORGE HESELTINE Trustee None on record
ALAN FREDERICK BALL Trustee
HELPING EAST LANKA PROGRESS Received: On time
GARY WILLIAM MILLER Trustee None on record
Stephen Peter Smith Trustee 25 February 2020 None on record
Geoffrey Raymond Smith Trustee 06 February 2020
HONOURABLE ARTILLERY COMPANY Received: On time
ROGER LESLIE BROOKER Trustee 13 February 2015 None on record
IAN DONALD HOOK Trustee None on record
BOB SHEPHERD Trustee
COPYHOLD ALLOTMENTS Received: On time
THE (CHELMSFORD) UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
UNKNOWN DONOR (OTHERWISE THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY) Received: On time
Dr CHRISTOPHER JON WILLIS Trustee 08 June 2016 None on record