THE JOYCE FRANKLAND TRUST, NEWPORT

Charity number: 310862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required